TX HB1231 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 35-5)
Status: Engrossed on May 8 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-12 - Referred to Business & Commerce
Pending: Senate Business & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the designation of Eid al-Fitr and Eid al-Adha as optional holidays.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the designation of Eid al-Fitr and Eid al-Adha as optional holidays.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-08 - House - Read 3rd time RV#908 (Y: 122 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-12SenateRead first time
2021-05-10SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-08HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-08HouseReason for vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-08HouseRecord vote RV#908
2021-05-08HousePassed
2021-05-08HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-07HousePassed to engrossment
2021-05-07HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-07HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-29HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-20HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-20HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-20HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-20HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback