TX HB1230 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-13 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to excluding the value of motor vehicles in determining eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Title
Relating to excluding the value of motor vehicles in determining eligibility for the supplemental nutrition assistance program.
Sponsors
Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-20 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1914 (Same As) 2021-05-22 - Not again placed on intent calendar