TX HB122 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-10 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Mobility Fund.
Title
Relating to the Texas Mobility Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - HB 122Third Reading House (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-10 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-20 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-20 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-04-08 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2015-04-08 | House | Amendment amended |
2015-04-08 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2015-04-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-03-30 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-03-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-23 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-19 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-03-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-03-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-18 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2015-02-18 | House | Read first time |
2014-11-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS MOBILITY FUND
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous
State Finances--Management & Control
TEXAS MOBILITY FUND
Transportation
TRANSPORTATION COMMISSION, TEXAS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Transportation--Miscellaneous