TX HB1209 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-10 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to contracts authorizing the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to contracts authorizing the use of photographic traffic signal enforcement systems.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-10HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-10HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-05-04HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-05-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Transportation
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-20HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback