TX HB1204 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-12 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the provision of services as an alternative to adjudication for certain children who engage in conduct in need of supervision or delinquent conduct and to a study on certain juvenile justice issues.
Title
Relating to the provision of services as an alternative to adjudication for certain children who engage in conduct in need of supervision or delinquent conduct and to a study on certain juvenile justice issues.
Sponsors
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Eugene Wu [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] | Sen. Royce West [D] |
Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1909 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#557 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#557 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-12 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-12 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-23 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COURT ADMINISTRATION, OFFICE OF
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice
Family
Family--Juvenile Delinquency
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
Minors
Minors--Juvenile Justice