TX HB120 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 22 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-01 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.

Summary

Relating to the issuance of a driver's license to a peace officer or a special investigator that includes an alternative to the officer's residence address.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the issuance of a driver's license to a peace officer or a special investigator that includes an alternative to the officer's residence address.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-05-01 Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
2009-05-01 Read first time
2009-04-23 Received from the House
2009-04-22 Reported engrossed
2009-04-22 Record vote
2009-04-22 Passed
2009-04-22 Read 3rd time
2009-04-22 Passed to engrossment
2009-04-22 Read 2nd time
2009-04-22 Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2009-04-20 Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
2009-04-15 Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2009-04-15 Committee report printed and distributed
2009-04-14 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2009-03-23 Reported favorably as substituted
2009-03-23 Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2009-03-23 Committee substitute considered in committee
2009-03-23 Vote reconsidered in committee
2009-03-23 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-18 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-03-18 Vote reconsidered in committee
2009-03-18 Considered in formal meeting
2009-03-16 Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2009-03-16 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-02 Left pending in committee
2009-03-02 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2009-03-02 Considered in public hearing
2009-03-02 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-02-12 Referred to Public Safety
2009-02-12 Read first time
2008-11-10 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback