TX HB1195 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 29-8)
Status: Passed on May 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-08 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the franchise tax treatment of certain loans and grants made under the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the franchise tax treatment of certain loans and grants made under the federal Coronavirus Aid, Relief, and Economic Security Act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#418 (Y: 143 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-01 - House - Read 3rd time RV#72 (Y: 148 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - Amended RV#65 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-08 Effective immediately
2021-05-08 Signed by the Governor
2021-04-27 Sent to the Governor
2021-04-27SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-04-26SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2021-04-26HouseSigned in the House
2021-04-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-04-23HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2021-04-23HouseRecord vote RV#418
2021-04-23HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2021-04-21HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-04-21HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-04-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenatePassed
2021-04-19SenateRead 3rd time
2021-04-19SenateRecord vote
2021-04-19SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-04-19SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-04-19SenateAmended
2021-04-19SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock
2021-04-19SenateRead 2nd time
2021-04-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-04-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-04-13SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-04-13SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2021-04-13SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-04-12SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-07SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-04-07SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-04-07SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-06SenateReferred to Finance
2021-04-06SenateRead first time
2021-04-06SenateReceived from the House
2021-04-01HouseReported engrossed
2021-04-01HouseRecord vote RV#72
2021-04-01HousePassed
2021-04-01HouseRead 3rd time
2021-03-31HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-03-31HouseRecord vote RV#65
2021-03-31HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-03-31HouseAmended 1-Geren
2021-03-31HouseRead 2nd time
2021-03-31HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-03-15HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-15HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-03-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-15HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB372 (Same As) 2021-04-15 - Co-author authorized

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1195
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01195I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01195H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01195E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01195S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01195F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01195H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01195S2F1.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01195I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01195H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01195H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01195E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01195E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01195F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1195&RcdVtNo=65&Ch=H&Dt=03/31/2021
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1195&RcdVtNo=72&Ch=H&Dt=04/01/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ-04-19-F.PDF#page=24
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1195&RcdVtNo=418&Ch=H&Dt=04/23/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ04-19-F.PDF#page=24

Bill Comments

feedback