TX HB1185 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 5 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-28 - Withdrawn from schedule
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation and operation of pediatric long-term care access assurance programs in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the creation and operation of pediatric long-term care access assurance programs in certain counties.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Dean [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | House | Withdrawn from schedule |
2023-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2023-01-05 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB746 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB746 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
SB746 (Same As) 2023-03-01 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
Health
Health--General
LONG-TERM CARE
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
County Government--General
Health
Health--General
LONG-TERM CARE
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=88R&Bill=HB1185 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/88R/billtext/html/HB01185I.htm |