TX HB1184 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-19 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to authorizing certain utility cost savings and alternative fuel programs as eligible for local government energy savings performance contracts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to authorizing certain utility cost savings and alternative fuel programs as eligible for local government energy savings performance contracts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-29 - House - HB 1184Third Reading House (Y: 133 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-19 Effective immediately
2015-06-19 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-29SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-29HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-29HouseRecord vote
2015-05-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-26HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenatePassed
2015-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-26SenateRecord vote
2015-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-26SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-26SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-26SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-21SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2015-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-05-04SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2015-05-04SenateRead first time
2015-04-14SenateReceived from the House
2015-04-14HouseReported engrossed
2015-04-13HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-13HouseRecord vote
2015-04-13HousePassed as amended
2015-04-13HouseAmended
2015-04-13HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-04-13HousePostponed
2015-04-13HouseRead 3rd time
2015-04-09HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2015-04-09HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2015-04-09HouseAmended
2015-04-09HouseLaid out as postponed business
2015-04-09HousePostponed
2015-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2015-04-08HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2015-04-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2015-03-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2015-03-29HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-03-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-03-23HouseReported favorably as substituted
2015-03-23HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-03-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-03HouseReferred to Energy Resources
2015-03-03HouseRead first time
2015-02-05HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback