TX HB1183 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-18 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to abolishing Confederate Heroes Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to abolishing Confederate Heroes Day.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-18HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback