TX HB1181 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain counties to authorize the operation of a golf cart or off-highway vehicle on certain roads.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain counties to authorize the operation of a golf cart or off-highway vehicle on certain roads.
Sponsors
Sen. Mayes Middleton [R] | Rep. Cody Vasut [R] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Geanie Morrison [R] |
Rep. J.M. Lozano [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - House - Read 3rd time RV#417 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-23 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Record vote RV#417 |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-04-23 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-23 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-12 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-09 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-31 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-31 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB1383 (Same As) 2021-03-18 - Referred to Transportation
Subjects
County Government
County Government--Roads
GULF OF MEXICO
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
RED RIVER
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road
County Government--Roads
GULF OF MEXICO
RECREATIONAL & ALL-TERRAIN VEHICLES
RED RIVER
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Rules of Road