TX HB1178 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-01 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the punishment for burglary and theft involving controlled substances.
Title
Relating to the punishment for burglary and theft involving controlled substances.
Sponsors
Rep. John Kuempel [R] | Rep. Joseph Moody [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. J.D. Sheffield [R] |
Rep. Justin Holland [R] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-21 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1523 (Y: 133 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#228 (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#219 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#228 (Y: 139 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-11 - House - Read 2nd time RV#219 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-01 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-01 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-22 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-21 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-21 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-21 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-21 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-20 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Meeting cancelled |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-12 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-12 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed |
2017-04-12 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-13 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed |