TX HB1177 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 44-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to carrying a handgun during a state of disaster.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to carrying a handgun during a state of disaster.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 16 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1957 (Y: 91 N: 52 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-19 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-17 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Amended RV#519 (Y: 102 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - Amended RV#501 (Y: 105 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-17 - House - RV#500 (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-27HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1957
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-23HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-23SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-23SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-20HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenatePassed
2019-05-19SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-19SenateRecord vote
2019-05-19SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-17SenateRecord vote
2019-05-17SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-15SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-04-24SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-04-24SenateRead first time
2019-04-23SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-22HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-18HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-18HouseRecord vote RV#519
2019-04-18HousePassed as amended
2019-04-18HouseAmended 1-Phelan
2019-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#501
2019-04-17HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-04-17HouseAmended 4-Stickland
2019-04-17HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) offered 3-Stickland
2019-04-17HousePoint of order sustained (amendment) Rule 11, Section 2
2019-04-17HouseAmendment(s) offered 2-Stickland
2019-04-17HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-17HouseRecord vote RV#500
2019-04-17HouseAmended 1-Phelan
2019-04-17HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-17HousePlaced on Major State Calendar
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-05HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-13HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-06HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Homeland Security & Public Safety
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-29HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB506 (Same As) 2019-02-14 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1177
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01177I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01177H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01177E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01177S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB01177F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1177&RcdVtNo=500&Ch=H&Dt=04/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1177&RcdVtNo=501&Ch=H&Dt=04/17/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1177&RcdVtNo=519&Ch=H&Dt=04/18/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-17-F.PDF#page=6
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-19-F.PDF#page=39
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB1177&RcdVtNo=1957&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=56

Bill Comments

feedback