TX HB1173 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 54-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibited logistical support by a governmental entity for procurement of an abortion or the services of an abortion provider.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibited logistical support by a governmental entity for procurement of an abortion or the services of an abortion provider.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-13HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-27HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-14HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-19HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB650 (Same As) 2021-05-03 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback