TX HB1172 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 15 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the rights of victims of sexual assault or other prohibited sexual conduct.
Title
Relating to the rights of victims of sexual assault or other prohibited sexual conduct.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-28 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1559 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#238 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - House - Read 3rd time RV#238 (Y: 146 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/21 | |
2021-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Sent to the Governor | |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2021-05-30 | House | Signed in the House |
2021-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2021-05-28 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2021-05-28 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2021-05-28 | House | Record vote RV#1559 |
2021-05-28 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2021-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-05-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-15 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#238 |
2021-04-15 | House | Passed |
2021-04-15 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2021-04-14 | House | Amended 1-Tinderholt |
2021-04-14 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-03-31 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-03-31 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-25 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-25 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-03-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-18 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-19 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CRIME VICTIMS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Law Enforcement
PEACE OFFICERS
SEXUAL ASSAULT