TX HB1166 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to liability of certain electric utilities that allow certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or leases.
Title
Relating to liability of certain electric utilities that allow certain uses of land that the electric utility owns, occupies, or leases.
Sponsors
Rep. Phil Stephenson [R] | Rep. Ron Reynolds [D] | Rep. John Zerwas [R] | Rep. Rick Miller [R] |
Sen. Lois Kolkhorst [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1089 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1089 (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-09 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-09 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-09 | House | Passed |
2017-05-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-08 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-08 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-06 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-01 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-01 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-19 | House | Filed |