TX HB1157 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas Life, Accident, Health, and Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association.
Title
Relating to the Texas Life, Accident, Health, and Hospital Service Insurance Guaranty Association.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Laid on the table subject to call | |
2011-04-14 | Companion considered in lieu of | |
2011-04-14 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-04-07 | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. | |
2011-04-07 | Withdrawn from calendar | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-23 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-15 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-03-01 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-03-01 | Read first time | |
2011-02-07 | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Life & Annuities
LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, TX
LIFE, ACCIDENT, HEALTH & HOSP SERV INS GUARANTY ASSN, TX
TEXAS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION ACT
Insurance--General
Insurance--Health & Accident
Insurance--Life & Annuities
LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION, TX
LIFE, ACCIDENT, HEALTH & HOSP SERV INS GUARANTY ASSN, TX
TEXAS LIFE AND HEALTH INSURANCE GUARANTY ASSOCIATION ACT