TX HB1155 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-27 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Recruit Texas Program to facilitate the relocation to or expansion in this state of employers offering complex or high-skilled employment opportunities.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Recruit Texas Program to facilitate the relocation to or expansion in this state of employers offering complex or high-skilled employment opportunities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-04 - House - HB 1155Third Reading House (Y: 92 N: 48 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-27 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-26 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Referred to Natural Resources & Economic Development |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-04 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-04 | House | Passed |
2015-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Amended |
2015-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-01 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-21 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-16 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2015-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-09 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-09 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred to Economic & Small Business Development |
2015-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-05 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Junior College Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS
Education--Junior College Districts
Labor
Labor--Workforce Development
TECHNICAL EDUCATION
WORKFORCE COMMISSION, TEXAS