TX HB1142 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 15 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Sent to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the creation and operations of health care provider participation programs in certain counties.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-14 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1384 (Y: 125 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#399 (Y: 122 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Read 2nd time RV#357 (Y: 125 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-16 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-16SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-15HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-15SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-14HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-14HouseRecord vote RV#1384
2019-05-14HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-10HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-10HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-09HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-09SenateRecord vote
2019-05-09SenatePassed
2019-05-09SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-09SenateRecord vote
2019-05-09SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-09SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-09SenateAmended
2019-05-09SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Watson
2019-05-09SenateRead 2nd time
2019-05-09SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-10SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-08SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-06SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-06SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-06SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-01SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-16SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-16HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-16HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-16HouseRecord vote RV#399
2019-04-16HousePassed
2019-04-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-15HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-15HouseRecord vote RV#357
2019-04-15HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-11HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-09HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-08HouseTransferred to Calendars Committee
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-04-03HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-04-02HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-02HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-26HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to County Affairs
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1099 (Same As) 2019-03-25 - Left pending in committee

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback