TX HB1142 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 34-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-08 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to prohibiting governmental contracts with a company doing business with Iran, Sudan, or a foreign terrorist organization.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to prohibiting governmental contracts with a company doing business with Iran, Sudan, or a foreign terrorist organization.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08HouseLaid on the table subject to call
2017-05-08HouseCompanion considered in lieu of
2017-05-05HousePostponed
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-28HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-27HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-13HouseReferred to State Affairs
2017-03-13HouseRead first time
2017-01-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback