TX HB1130 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-26 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a district or county attorney participating as counsel in certain proceedings.
Title
Relating to a district or county attorney participating as counsel in certain proceedings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - House - Read 3rd time RV#472 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Referred to Jurisprudence |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Received from the House |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-25 | House | Record vote RV#472 |
2023-04-25 | House | Passed |
2023-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2023-04-24 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-24 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-04-19 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2023-04-03 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2023-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2022-12-29 | House | Filed |