TX HB1128 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 9 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-09 - Effective on 9/1/21
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to persons permitted to be in a polling place or a place where ballots are being counted.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to persons permitted to be in a polling place or a place where ballots are being counted.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - House - Read 3rd time RV#755 (Y: 98 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-09 Effective on 9/1/21
2021-06-09 Signed by the Governor
2021-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2021-05-25SenateSigned in the Senate
2021-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2021-05-23HouseReported enrolled
2021-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenatePassed
2021-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-22SenateRecord vote
2021-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-22SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2021-05-21SenateRecord vote
2021-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-20SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-19SenateCorrected comm. report printed & distributed
2021-05-19SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-19SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2021-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateLeft pending in committee
2021-05-13SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-13SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-13SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-10SenateReferred to State Affairs
2021-05-10SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-05HouseRecord vote RV#755
2021-05-05HousePassed
2021-05-05HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-04HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-04HouseAmendment fails of adoption 2-Rosenthal
2021-05-04HouseAmended 1-Bucy
2021-05-04HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-14HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-13HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-01HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-01HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-01HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-18HouseRecommitted to committee
2021-03-16HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-16HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-15HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-11HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-11HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-11HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-11HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Elections
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB605 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1128
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01128I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01128H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01128E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01128S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB01128F.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01128H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB01128H22.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01128I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01128H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01128H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB01128E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB01128E.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB1128&RcdVtNo=755&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=20
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-22-F1.PDF#page=2

Bill Comments

feedback