TX HB1115 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2013 - 25% progression
Action: 2013-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the eligibility for grants for natural gas fueling stations under the Texas natural gas vehicle grant program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the eligibility for grants for natural gas fueling stations under the Texas natural gas vehicle grant program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-05-07HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2013-05-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2013-05-07HouseConsidered in Calendars
2013-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-18HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-09HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-26HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-27HouseReferred to Environmental Regulation
2013-02-27HouseCorrection in referral
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Natural Resources
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback