TX HB1114 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to providing mental health services and mental health education to public school students at school-based health centers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to providing mental health services and mental health education to public school students at school-based health centers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-03-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-23HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Public Education
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-14HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB325 (Same As) 2021-03-09 - Referred to Education

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback