TX HB1112 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 12 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the removal of signs indicating that a freestanding emergency medical care facility is operational.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the removal of signs indicating that a freestanding emergency medical care facility is operational.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-12 - House - Read 3rd time RV#320 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-17SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-17SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-04-15SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-12HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-12HouseRecord vote RV#320
2019-04-12HousePassed
2019-04-12HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-12HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-12HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2019-04-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2019-03-22HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2019-03-20HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-20HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-18HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-13HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-03-13HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-13HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-26HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-26HouseRead first time
2019-01-28HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback