TX HB1106 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the imposition of a supplemental court security fee on conviction of certain criminal offenses and the use of revenue from that fee.
Title
Relating to the imposition of a supplemental court security fee on conviction of certain criminal offenses and the use of revenue from that fee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-30 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-21 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-21 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-14 | House | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local
City Government--Finance
County Government
County Government--Finance
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--Local