TX HB1104 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to sexual assault and domestic violence awareness continuing education for cosmetology license holders.
Title
Relating to sexual assault and domestic violence awareness continuing education for cosmetology license holders.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-04 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2017-05-04 | House | Withdrawn from calendar |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-26 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-20 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CONTINUING EDUCATION
COSMETOLOGISTS
Family
Family--Family Violence
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUAL ASSAULT
COSMETOLOGISTS
Family
Family--Family Violence
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS COMMISSION OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Other Trades & Professions
SEXUAL ASSAULT