TX HB1101 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 1/1/18
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal district to require a person to file a new application to confirm the person's current qualification for the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the total appraised value of the residence homestead of a 100 percent disabled veteran.
Title
Relating to the authority of the chief appraiser of an appraisal district to require a person to file a new application to confirm the person's current qualification for the exemption from ad valorem taxation of the total appraised value of the residence homestead of a 100 percent disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-17 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#518 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-05-17 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#518 (Y: 131 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective on 1/1/18 | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-19 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-18 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-18 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Corrected comm. report printed & distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-28 | House | Passed |
2017-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Transferred to Calendars Committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-22 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Military & Veterans
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Military & Veterans
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions