TX HB1101 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-17 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to extending the period over which the balance of the system benefit fund is to be eliminated.
Title
Relating to extending the period over which the balance of the system benefit fund is to be eliminated.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-08 - House - HB 1101Third Reading House (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-17 | Effective immediately | |
2015-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-25 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-05-09 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2015-05-08 | House | Passed |
2015-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-05-07 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2015-05-05 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2015-04-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-04-21 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-04-15 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-04-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-04-15 | House | Recalled from subcommittee |
2015-04-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-02 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PUBLIC UTILITY COMMISSION
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--Electric
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Management & Control
Utilities
Utilities--Electric