TX HB1098 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-24 - Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the amount of late fees that may be charged to certain tenants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the amount of late fees that may be charged to certain tenants.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-24HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2017-04-23HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-21HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2017-04-19HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2017-02-21HouseRead first time
2017-01-18HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback