TX HB1098 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-07 - Referred to Health & Human Services
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to family cost share provisions in the early childhood intervention program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to family cost share provisions in the early childhood intervention program.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-04-18 - House - HB 1098Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-04-22SenateReceived from the House
2013-04-18HouseReported engrossed
2013-04-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18HouseRecord vote
2013-04-18HousePassed
2013-04-18HouseRead 3rd time
2013-04-18HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2013-04-18HousePassed to engrossment
2013-04-18HouseRead 2nd time
2013-04-18HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-15HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-08HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-02HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2013-04-02HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-12HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-12HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-03-12HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-12HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-19HouseReferred to Human Services
2013-02-19HouseRead first time
2013-02-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback