TX HB1095 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Left pending in subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the dedication of certain wine-related revenue.
Title
Relating to the dedication of certain wine-related revenue.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee substitute considered in s/c |
2015-04-08 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2015-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred directly to s/c on Budget Transparency and Reform by chair |
2015-03-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-03 | House | Read first time |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
WINE & WINERIES
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
Taxation
Taxation--Alcoholic Beverages
WINE & WINERIES
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB1095 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB01095I.htm |