TX HB1093 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-01 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to petty cash funds for county welfare departments in certain populous counties.
Title
Relating to petty cash funds for county welfare departments in certain populous counties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-23 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-23 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-18 | House | Filed |