TX HB1093 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Effective on 9/1/09
Summary
Relating to oversight of regional poison control centers and the poison control network.
Title
Relating to oversight of regional poison control centers and the poison control network.
Sponsors
Sen. Jane Nelson [R] | Rep. Joe Pickett [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Effective on 9/1/09 | |
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-24 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-21 | Senate passage reported | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Passed | |
2009-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-21 | Record vote | |
2009-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2009-05-21 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-07 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-06 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-04 | Referred to Health & Human Services | |
2009-05-04 | Read first time | |
2009-04-29 | Received from the House | |
2009-04-28 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-28 | Record vote | |
2009-04-28 | Passed | |
2009-04-28 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-04-27 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-27 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2009-04-27 | Amended | |
2009-04-27 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2009-04-24 | Postponed | |
2009-04-24 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-24 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-15 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-14 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-03-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-03-23 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2009-03-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-16 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-03-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-02 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-02 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-24 | Referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-24 | Read first time | |
2009-02-05 | Filed |
Subjects
Health
Health--General
POISON CONTROL CENTERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Health--General
POISON CONTROL CENTERS
State Agencies, Boards & Commissions
STATE EMERGENCY COMMUNICATIONS, COMMISSION ON
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF