TX HB1091 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-14 - Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Relations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of certain hospital districts to contract for the performance of administrative functions and services.
Title
Relating to the authority of certain hospital districts to contract for the performance of administrative functions and services.
Sponsors
Rep. John Davis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations | |
2011-04-14 | Read first time | |
2011-04-11 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-08 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-07 | Record vote | |
2011-04-07 | Passed | |
2011-04-07 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-07 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-07 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-04-04 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-30 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-29 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-22 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-22 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-22 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-03-17 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-17 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-17 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-17 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to County Affairs | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-02-02 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Hospitals
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Hospital
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=82R&Bill=HB1091 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/82R/billtext/html/HB01091I.htm |