TX HB1090 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-04 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: Senate State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the criminal penalties for insider trading and other misuse of official information by public servants.
Title
Relating to the criminal penalties for insider trading and other misuse of official information by public servants.
Sponsors
Rep. Morgan Meyer [R] | Rep. Angie Button [R] | Sen. Pat Fallon [R] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] |
Rep. Matt Rinaldi [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#262 (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-18 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-18 | House | Passed |
2017-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-17 | House | Amended |
2017-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-30 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-23 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to General Investigating & Ethics |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |