TX HB1086 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-12 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the criminal penalties for certain criminal offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the criminal penalties for certain criminal offenses.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-12HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-05-10HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-05-03HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-01HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-03-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-03-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-03-22HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-03-22HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-03-22HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-04HouseReferred to Criminal Jurisprudence
2021-03-04HouseRead first time
2021-01-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback