TX HB1083 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing a regulatory authority to establish reduced water utility rates funded by donations for the benefit of certain elderly customers.
Title
Relating to authorizing a regulatory authority to establish reduced water utility rates funded by donations for the benefit of certain elderly customers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#346 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Amended RV#336 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Passed (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-19 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#346 (Y: 130 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Amended RV#336 (Y: 137 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Constitutional three day rule suspended RV#317 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-26 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-21 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-20 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Point of order withdrawn |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Point of order |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture, Water, & Rural Affairs |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-04-20 | House | Amended |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-19 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-19 | House | Constitutional three day rule suspended |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |