TX HB1081 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the new instructional facility allotment under the foundation school program.
Title
Relating to the new instructional facility allotment under the foundation school program.
Sponsors
Rep. Diana Arevalo [D] | Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Harold Dutton [D] | Rep. Diego Bernal [D] |
Rep. Barbara Gervin-Hawkins [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1854 (Y: 101 N: 41 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 2nd time RV#704 (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#791 (Y: 93 N: 49 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - Read 2nd time RV#704 (Y: 108 N: 34 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-28 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-05 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-05 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-04 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-04 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-04 | House | Passed |
2017-05-04 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-03 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-03 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-03 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-25 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-28 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-17 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Facilities
Education--Primary & Secondary--Finance
FOUNDATION SCHOOL PROGRAM