TX HB1075 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-25 - Left pending in subcommittee

Summary

Relating to service of process at the registered office of certain registered agents.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to service of process at the registered office of certain registered agents.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-03-25 Left pending in subcommittee
2009-03-25 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
2009-03-25 Considered by s/c in public hearing
2009-03-25 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2009-03-09 Subcommittee members named
2009-03-09 Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
2009-02-24 Referred to Business & Industry
2009-02-24 Read first time
2009-02-05 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback