TX HB1063 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Texas State Guard uniform and insignia fund.
Title
Relating to the Texas State Guard uniform and insignia fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Cecil Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-05-07 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-05-06 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-05-06 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-05-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-27 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-04 | House | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | House | Read first time |
2021-01-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE GUARD, TEXAS
State Finances--Appropriations
State Finances--Budget
State Finances--Management & Control
STATE GUARD, TEXAS