TX HB1053 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the administration, powers, and duties of certain navigation districts; authorizing the imposition of a tax.
Title
Relating to the administration, powers, and duties of certain navigation districts; authorizing the imposition of a tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1953 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#307 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1953 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#307 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-26 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2019-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-26 | House | Record vote RV#1953 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2019-05-25 | House | Corrected Conference Committee Report distributed |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Corrected Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-25 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-24 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | House appoints conferees |
2019-05-23 | House | House requests conference committee |
2019-05-23 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-22 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA2 Lucio |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Lucio |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Referred to Transportation |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-11 | House | Record vote RV#307 |
2019-04-11 | House | Passed |
2019-04-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-10 | House | Amended 2-Guillen |
2019-04-10 | House | Amended 1-Guillen |
2019-04-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-04 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-20 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PORT OF HARLINGEN AUTHORITY
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WILLACY COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT
Property Interests
Property Interests--Real Property
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Navigation & Ports
Special Districts & Authorities--Water & Utility
WILLACY COUNTY NAVIGATION DISTRICT