TX HB1052 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to use the state participation account of the water development fund to provide financial assistance for the development of certain facilities.
Title
Relating to the authority of the Texas Water Development Board to use the state participation account of the water development fund to provide financial assistance for the development of certain facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#527 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-18 - House - Read 3rd time RV#527 (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Effective on 9/1/19 | |
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-23 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-23 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Water & Rural Affairs |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-18 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-18 | House | Record vote RV#527 |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed |
2019-04-18 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-17 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-15 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-11 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-02 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-02 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-03-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to Natural Resources |
2019-02-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-01-24 | House | Filed |
Subjects
COMPTROLLER OF PUBLIC ACCOUNTS
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
PERMITS
State Finances
State Finances--Management & Control
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD, TEXAS
Water--Development
Water--General
Water--Rights