TX HB1048 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the acknowledgment by management of risks identified in state agency information security plans.
Title
Relating to the acknowledgment by management of risks identified in state agency information security plans.
Sponsors
Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Kevin Roberts [R] | Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] |
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Lina Ortega [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-30 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-28 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-22 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed |