TX HB1043 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a prohibition against covenants not to compete for certain low-wage employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a prohibition against covenants not to compete for certain low-wage employees.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-10HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2023-05-08HouseConsidered in Calendars
2023-05-06HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2023-05-05HouseCommittee report distributed
2023-05-05HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2023-04-26HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2023-04-26HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2023-04-24HouseLeft pending in committee
2023-04-24HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2023-04-24HouseConsidered in public hearing
2023-04-24HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2023-03-02HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2023-03-02HouseRead first time
2022-12-19HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback