TX HB1041 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
Pending: Senate Criminal Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the review of certain privately operated residential facilities for persons released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Title
Relating to the review of certain privately operated residential facilities for persons released on parole or to mandatory supervision.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended |
2017-04-21 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-06 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-03-30 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-30 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Corrections |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing
Housing--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF
Corrections
Corrections--Parole, Probation & Pardons
CRIMINAL JUSTICE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Housing
Housing--General
MANDATORY & COMMUNITY SUPERVISION
PARDONS & PAROLES, BOARD OF