TX HB1036 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coverage for certain breast cancer screening procedures under certain health benefit plans.
Title
Relating to coverage for certain breast cancer screening procedures under certain health benefit plans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-28 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 25 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1988 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#886 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-28 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1988 (Y: 127 N: 18 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Passed (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#886 (Y: 130 N: 11 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-28 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-28 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-28 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-28 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2017-05-27 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2017-05-27 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | House appoints conferees |
2017-05-25 | House | House requests conference committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-07 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-01 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-19 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-04 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-04 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
CANCER
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MAMMOGRAPHY
Women
CANCER
Health
Health--Other Diseases & Medical Conditions
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MAMMOGRAPHY
Women