TX HB1020 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to volunteer practice by an inactive member of the State Bar of Texas.
Title
Relating to volunteer practice by an inactive member of the State Bar of Texas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#136 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read 2nd time RV#123 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - Read 3rd time RV#136 (Y: 141 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-29 - House - Read 2nd time RV#123 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-31 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-30 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-30 | House | Passed |
2017-03-30 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-29 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-03-29 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-03-27 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-21 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-03-21 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2017-03-06 | House | Read first time |
2017-01-12 | House | Filed |