TX HB1020 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the certification of alcohol awareness programs required for minors convicted of or receiving deferred disposition for certain alcohol offenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the certification of alcohol awareness programs required for minors convicted of or receiving deferred disposition for certain alcohol offenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-05-02 - House - HB 1020Third Reading House (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-14 Effective immediately
2013-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2013-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2013-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2013-05-24HouseSigned in the House
2013-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2013-05-23HouseSenate passage reported
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenatePassed
2013-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2013-05-22SenateRecord vote
2013-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2013-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2013-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2013-05-22SenateLaid before the Senate
2013-05-21SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2013-05-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2013-05-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2013-05-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-15SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-14SenateLeft pending in committee
2013-05-14SenateTestimony taken in committee
2013-05-14SenateConsidered in public hearing
2013-05-14SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-05-07SenateReferred to Criminal Justice
2013-05-07SenateRead first time
2013-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2013-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2013-05-02HouseRecord vote
2013-05-02HousePassed
2013-05-02HouseRead 3rd time
2013-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2013-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2013-05-02HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2013-04-29HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2013-04-22HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2013-04-21HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-19HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-16HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-16HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2013-04-16HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-04-09HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-04-09HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-09HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-04-09HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-25HouseReferred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
2013-02-25HouseRead first time
2013-02-06HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback