TX HB1020 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Left pending in committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to minimum liability insurance coverage amounts for persons convicted of offenses related to the operation of a motor vehicle while intoxicated.
Title
Relating to minimum liability insurance coverage amounts for persons convicted of offenses related to the operation of a motor vehicle while intoxicated.
Sponsors
Rep. Drew Darby [R] | Rep. Yvonne Davis [D] | Rep. Sid Miller [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-18 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-04-20 | Referred to Business & Commerce | |
2011-04-20 | Read first time | |
2011-04-18 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-15 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-14 | Record vote | |
2011-04-14 | Passed | |
2011-04-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-13 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-04-13 | Amended | |
2011-04-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-06 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-28 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-25 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-25 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-15 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-15 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-28 | Referred to Insurance | |
2011-02-28 | Read first time | |
2011-01-31 | Filed |
Subjects
Insurance
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility
Insurance--Motor Vehicles
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--DWI & DUID
Vehicles & Traffic--Insurance/Financial Responsibility